CT SB01033 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To include computer science and financial literacy instruction in the high school graduation requirements.
Title
An Act Concerning The Inclusion Of Computer Science And Financial Literacy As Part Of The High School Graduation Requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-19 | Senate | File Number 519 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 300 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |