CT SB01028 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To require Connecticut Innovations, Incorporated to study private equity investment in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Connecticut Innovations, Incorporated And Private Equity Investment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 268 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 98 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-06SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-06SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-05SenatePublic Act 19-22
2019-06-01SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-01SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-01SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-10SenateHouse Calendar Number 556
2019-05-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-08SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-08SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-08SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7971
2019-03-28SenateFile Number 236
2019-03-28SenateSenate Calendar Number 107
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-15SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-08SenatePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback