CT SB01028 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - House Calendar Number 571
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - House Calendar Number 571
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To extend the statute of limitations for an injured minor to bring a negligence action to one year after the minor attains the age of majority.
Title
An Act Concerning The Tolling Of The Statute Of Limitations For A Negligence Action Brought By A Minor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 168 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 7294 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 167 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 7294 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 167 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 7294 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | House Calendar Number 571 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7294 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | File Number 659 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 372 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |