CT SB01008 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Department of Developmental Services to be financially responsible for the costs associated with the residential placement of a student.
Title
An Act Concerning The Financial Responsibility Of Boards Of Education Resulting From Residential Placements By The Department Of Developmental Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/16 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |