CT SB00998 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To make minor revisions to various environment related statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Minor Revisions To Environment Related Statutes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 375 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05HouseBill Passed Temporarily
2019-06-05HouseHouse Calendar Number 735
2019-06-05HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-06-05HouseTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-05SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 11059
2019-04-10SenateFile Number 599
2019-04-10SenateSenate Calendar Number 286
2019-04-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-10SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-25SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-18SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-06SenatePublic Hearing 03/11
2019-03-05SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback