CT SB00983 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To expand the Insurance Department's financial regulatory oversight authority over insurance companies.
Title
An Act Concerning The Insurance Department's Financial Regulatory Oversight Of Insurance Companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 301 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 240 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 240 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Public Act 15-144 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-06-01 | Senate | House Passed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 620 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-20 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | File Number 268 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 192 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |