CT SB00977 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To expand medical assistance for treatment of obesity.
Title
An Act Concerning Medical Assistance For Surgery And Medical Services Related To Treatment Of Obesity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 272 (Y: 98 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 172 (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 172 (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Public Act 23-94 |
2023-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2023-06-05 | House | House Passed |
2023-05-18 | House | House Calendar Number 537 |
2023-05-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2023-05-02 | Senate | File Number 672 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 402 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/23 5:00 PM |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |