CT SB00973 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require input from residents councils and family councils at long-term care facilities on any state-wide policies affecting living conditions for residents of such facilities.
Title
An Act Strengthening The Voice Of Residents And Family Councils.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 371 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 308 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 308 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Public Act 21-194 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-03 | Senate | House Calendar Number 586 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-06-02 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8483 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | File Number 192 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 154 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |