CT SB00968 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To establish in connection with the Commission on Economic Competitiveness a health data collaborative to examine and report on precision medicine and personalized health and the health data issues relating to those fields.
Title
An Act Establishing A Health Data Collaborative Working Group.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 358 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 82 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 82 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Public Act 17-85 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-06-06 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-06-06 | Senate | House Passed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | House Calendar Number 447 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-19 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | File Number 378 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 191 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 10:00 AM |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |