CT SB00961 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - House Calendar Number 639
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - House Calendar Number 639
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize municipalities, by local option, to exempt all horses and ponies from property taxation; to increase the property tax exemption for farm machinery; to amend the date on which a qualified foresters report must be submitted; to require property owners to provide notice of an excepted transfer of land classified as farm land, open space land, forest land or maritime heritage land, and to make other changes concerning the assessment of such classified land.
Title
An Act Concerning The Assessment Of Livestock And Farm Machinery And The Transfer Of Land Classified As Farm Land, Open Space Land, Forest Land And Maritime Heritage Land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 359 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | Senate | House Calendar Number 639 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-22 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Matter Pass Retained |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 6835 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-07 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-03-27 | Senate | File Number 194 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 196 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |