CT SB00954 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Senate Recommitted to Public Health
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Senate Recommitted to Public Health
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning Transparency Of Executive Pay In Certain Hospital Transactions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Public Health |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-02 | Senate | File Number 444 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 278 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |