CT SB00948 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Energy and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Energy and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To determine how to continue the development of energy-related technologies in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning Development Of Energy-related Technologies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Energy and Technology |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-27 | Senate | File Number 191 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 181 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |