CT SB00945 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Department of Education.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Department Of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 384 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 278 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 278 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Public Act 21-144 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Passed |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Calendar Number 563 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-26 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-04 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-06 | Senate | File Number 290 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 181 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |