CT SB00945 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize the South Central Connecticut Regional Water Authority to invest in certain noncore businesses, including energy projects.
Title
An Act Concerning The South Central Connecticut Regional Water Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - House - House Roll Call Vote 281 (Y: 123 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 175 PASS (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 175 PASS (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Special Act 17-5 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Passed |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House Calendar Number 601 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | File Number 414 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 219 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |