CT SB00945 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-05 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-05 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To lower the threshold for mandatory electronic filing from two hundred fifty thousand dollars to four thousand five hundred dollars, to make electronic filing provisions applicable to all candidates and to make individuals and committees that make or obligate to make independent expenditures in excess of one thousand dollars subject to the mandatory electronic filing requirement.
Title
An Act Concerning Electronic Submission Of Campaign Reports With The State Elections Enforcement Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-04-18 | File Number 564 | |
2011-04-18 | Senate Calendar Number 344 | |
2011-04-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-18 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-11 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-31 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-30 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-02-10 | Public Hearing 02/14 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |