CT SB00939 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To protect elderly persons by providing information on persons convicted of crimes against the elderly.
Title
An Act Concerning A Registry Of Criminal Offenders Whose Victims Are Elderly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |