CT SB00938 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Aging
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Aging
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow a qualified Medicare beneficiary, to the extent permissible by federal law, to purchase a Medicare supplement policy.
Title
An Act Concerning The Purchase Of Medicare Supplement Policies By Qualified Medicare Beneficiaries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Aging |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-24 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2013-03-20 | Senate | File Number 70 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 116 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |