CT SB00932 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-04 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-04 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) increase the penalty for intentionally injuring a police animal or dog in a volunteer canine search and rescue team; (2) establish a penalty for annoying, teasing, tormenting or harassing a police animal confined in a motor vehicle; (3) allow emergency medical services personnel to provide emergency treatment and transportation to an injured police animal under certain circumstances; and (4) establish a grant program to provide canine officers with body armor.
Title
An Act Concerning Police Animals And Dogs In Volunteer Canine Search And Rescue Teams.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-01 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 43 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-02 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-04-03 | Senate | File Number 375 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 211 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |