CT SB00928 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To encourage the development of a market for recycled materials.
Title
An Act Concerning Recycled Content For Products Sold In Connecticut.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 252 (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 277 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 277 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Special Act 21-9 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-02 | Senate | House Passed |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Calendar Number 562 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-26 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-04-13 | Senate | File Number 425 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 256 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |