CT SB00927 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the sewage spill right-to-know statute to provide for timely notification to the public of sewage spills that may pose a threat to the public health or the environment.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To The Sewage Spill Right-to-know Statute.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 275 (Y: 127 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 86 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 86 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Public Act 21-42 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Senate | House Passed |
2021-04-15 | Senate | House Calendar Number 359 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | File Number 217 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 165 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |