CT SB00914 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-24 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Education
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-24 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Education
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To apply the same restrictions concerning the application of pesticides at day care centers to the application of pesticides at municipal parks.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study The Health Effects Of The Use Of Pesticides.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education |
2013-04-15 | Senate | File Number 486 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 362 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |