CT SB00913 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require each municipality that sponsors a group health policy or plan to submit information regarding such policy or plan to the State Comptroller for analysis and to allow the Comptroller to enter into cooperative health care agreements that may allow individuals to acquire low-cost, high-quality health care.
Title
An Act Concerning The Enrollment Of Nonstate Public Employees In The State Employee Health Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 240 AS AMENDED (Y: 82 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 239 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 58 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 260 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 259 ADOPT SENATE AMD F LCO 7828 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 258 ADOPT SENATE AMD E LCO 8038 (Y: 14 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 257 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 7870 (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 256 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 7903 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 255 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 7933 (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 239 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 58 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 260 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 259 ADOPT SENATE AMD F LCO 7828 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 258 ADOPT SENATE AMD E LCO 8038 (Y: 14 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 257 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 7870 (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 256 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 7903 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 255 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 7933 (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Public Act 15-93 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-05-27 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule B 8349 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 8341 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 631 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule F 7828 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 8038 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Recalled E 8038 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule E 8038 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 7870 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 7903 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 7933 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7725 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-06 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development |
2015-03-31 | Senate | File Number 338 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 238 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |