CT SB00911 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - House Calendar Number 490
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - House Calendar Number 490
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the threshold dollar amount for misdemeanor and felony unemployment compensation fraud.
Title
An Act Increasing The Threshold Amount For Felony Unemployment Compensation Fraud.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 131 (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (MOTION FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-16 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (MOTION FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-16 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | House Calendar Number 490 |
2023-05-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-06 | Senate | File Number 13 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 45 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/23 12:00 PM |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Motion Failed (CR) |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Public Hearing 01/31 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |