CT SB00907 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To make minor and technical changes to the Workers' Compensation Act.
Title
An Act Concerning Minor And Technical Changes To The Workers' Compensation Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 157 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 182 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 182 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Public Act 21-18 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-05-20 | Senate | House Passed |
2021-05-14 | Senate | House Calendar Number 497 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-13 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | File Number 286 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 194 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |