CT SB00899 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-11 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-11 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To permit the transfer of research and development tax credits to encourage commercial or residential development projects in enterprise zones.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Research And Development Tax Credits For Projects In Enterprise Zones.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-14 | File Number 61 | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Calendar Number 69 | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-14 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-02-25 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-02-24 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-02-10 | Public Hearing 02/15 | |
2011-02-04 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |