CT SB00892 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Children and Families to report annually to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to children and appropriations concerning the safety and well-being of youths placed in out-of-home settings that are licensed, administered and investigated by the Department of Children and Families.
Title
An Act Concerning The Provision Of Certain Information Pertaining To Congregate Care Facilities Licensed Or Administered By The Department Of Children And Families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 367 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 233 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 233 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Special Act 19-19 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Calendar Number 678 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9367 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | File Number 137 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 88 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |