CT SB00879 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 723
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 723
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning Transparency For Quasi-public Agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | File Number 723 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 334 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |