CT SB00858 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require a study of issues concerning revisions to the higher education statutes and to make technical corrections to such statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Kirklyn M. Kerr Program, A Strategic Plan For Higher Education, Chefa, The Tracking Of Unique Identifiers By Institutions Of Higher Education And Technical Revisions To The Higher Education Statutes.
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Bye [D] | Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] | Sen. Edwin Gomes [D] | House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee |
Rep. Bruce Morris [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Sen. Andrea Stillman [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 336 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-08 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-24 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-17 | Public Act 11-70 | |
2011-06-07 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-07 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-07 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2011-06-07 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B | |
2011-06-07 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-03 | House Calendar Number 592 | |
2011-06-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-06-02 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-02 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A, B | |
2011-06-02 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 6867 | |
2011-06-02 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6560 | |
2011-04-04 | File Number 330 | |
2011-04-04 | Senate Calendar Number 221 | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-04 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-28 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-17 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-15 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | |
2011-02-04 | Public Hearing 02/08 | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |