CT SB00847 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Planning and Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Planning and Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning The Commission For Technology Advancement.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Williams [D] | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. Brendan Sharkey [D] | Rep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D] |
Rep. Roberta Willis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Planning and Development |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-03 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Energy and Technology |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Energy and Technology |
2013-04-18 | Senate | File Number 560 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 410 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |