CT SB00840 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To implement the recommendations of the Department of Public Health regarding immunization rates for each public and private school in Connecticut.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Department Of Public Health's Recommendations Regarding Immunization Rates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-24 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27SenateChange of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
2017-03-27SenateChange of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2017-03-24SenateChange of Reference Appropriations
2017-03-13SenateFavorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education
2017-03-13SenateFavorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education
2017-03-13SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-07SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-06SenateJoint Favorable Change of Reference Education
2017-02-17SenatePublic Hearing 02/22
2017-02-16SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback