CT SB00835 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit deceptive advertising practices by limited services pregnancy centers. .
Title
An Act Concerning Deceptive Advertising Practices Of Limited Services Pregnancy Centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 144 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 50 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 145 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 50 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 146 HOUSE AMD C (Y: 49 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 147 HOUSE AMD D (Y: 49 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 148 HOUSE AMD E (Y: 51 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 149 HOUSE AMD F (Y: 50 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 150 (Y: 87 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 123 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 124 (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 121 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 122 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 145 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 50 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 146 HOUSE AMD C (Y: 49 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 147 HOUSE AMD D (Y: 49 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 148 HOUSE AMD E (Y: 51 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 149 HOUSE AMD F (Y: 50 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-05-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 150 (Y: 87 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 123 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 124 (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 121 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 122 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Public Act 21-17 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-05-19 | Senate | House Passed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule F 8864 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule E 8886 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 8906 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 8868 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 8816 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 8887 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | House Calendar Number 453 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 7996 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8014 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | File Number 38 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 61 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/21 5:00 PM |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/10 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |