CT SB00813 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - House Calendar Number 675
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - House Calendar Number 675
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Education to conduct a study of issues relating to early college and dual enrollment programs.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of Issues Relating To Early College And Dual Enrollment Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 232 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Calendar Number 675 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-28 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | File Number 131 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 82 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |