CT SB00809 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To enable the Insurance Commissioner to adopt regulations concerning credits for reinsurance, and to make minor conforming changes to statutes concerning reinsurance.
Title
An Act Enabling The Insurance Commissioner To Adopt Regulations Concerning Credits For Reinsurance And Making Minor Conforming Changes To Statutes Concerning Reinsurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 290 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 171 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 171 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Public Act 17-59 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-06-01 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-01 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House Calendar Number 596 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-24 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6120 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | File Number 155 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 117 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |