CT SB00778 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-07 - House Calendar Number 656
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-07 - House Calendar Number 656
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To limit the expenses for consultants borne by telecommunications providers.
Title
An Act Concerning Expenses For Consultants Borne By Telecommunications Providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 320 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8848 (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 321 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 321 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | Senate | House Calendar Number 656 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8848 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | File Number 340 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 178 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |