CT SB00763 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To make paratransit vehicle drivers mandatory reporters of suspected abuse of elderly persons.
Title
An Act Requiring Drivers Of Paratransit Vehicles To Report Suspected Abuse, Neglect, Exploitation Or Abandonment Of Elderly Persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 317 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 306 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 306 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Public Act 21-122 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-07 | Senate | House Passed |
2021-06-03 | Senate | House Calendar Number 582 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-06-02 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-04 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-09 | Senate | File Number 36 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 59 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/21 5:00 PM |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/16 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |