CT SB00754 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Public Hearing 02/24
Pending: Joint Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Public Hearing 02/24
Pending: Joint Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To limit the charging of assessments or user fees by the Connecticut Health Insurance Exchange to health carriers that offer qualified health plans through the exchange.
Title
An Act Limiting The Charging Of Assessments Or User Fees By The Connecticut Health Insurance Exchange.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |