CT SB00749 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - File Number 317
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require legislative approval for the merger or closing of institutions within the Connecticut State Colleges and Universities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring Legislative Approval For The Merger Or Closing Of Institutions Within The Connecticut State Colleges And Universities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateFile Number 317
2019-04-02SenateSenate Calendar Number 158
2019-04-02SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-02SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable
2019-02-15SenatePublic Hearing 02/21
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
2019-02-13SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-07SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback