CT SB00749 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - File Number 317
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - File Number 317
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require legislative approval for the merger or closing of institutions within the Connecticut State Colleges and Universities.
Title
An Act Requiring Legislative Approval For The Merger Or Closing Of Institutions Within The Connecticut State Colleges And Universities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | File Number 317 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 158 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |