CT SB00707 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Senate Recommitted to Aging
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Senate Recommitted to Aging
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure nursing home ownership and management are notified of the state's interest in protecting the health and well-being of elderly and infirm persons in their care.
Title
An Act Concerning Notification Of The State's Interest In Protecting Nursing Home Residents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Aging |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-14 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Public Health |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health |
2015-03-23 | Senate | File Number 149 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 144 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/05 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |