CT SB00684 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Senate Recommitted to Public Health
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Senate Recommitted to Public Health
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require training in cardiopulmonary resuscitation to be provided as part of a program of instruction in public schools and to allow local and regional boards of education to accept gifts, grants and donations to purchase materials needed for such training.
Title
An Act Concerning Training In Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Public Health |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Education |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education |
2015-04-02 | Senate | File Number 432 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 277 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |