CT SB00652 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-15 - House Calendar Number 572
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-15 - House Calendar Number 572
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To create a pilot program to refer children thirty-six months of age or younger who are the victims of substantiated abuse or neglect to the birth-to-three program.
Title
An Act Concerning Referrals From The Department Of Children And Families To The Birth-to-three Program.
Sponsors
House Children Committee | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Sen. Dante Bartolomeo [D] | Rep. Michael Molgano [R] |
Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 272 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | House Calendar Number 572 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-14 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-08 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Human Services |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Matter Pass Retained |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6011 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | File Number 246 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 204 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |