CT SB00604 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - Public Hearing 02/27
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - Public Hearing 02/27
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the submission of quasi-public agency employment and consulting contracts and separation agreements to the Attorney General and relevant legislative committee for review and comment.
Title
An Act Requiring Executive And Legislative Review Of Certain Quasi-public Agency Contracts And Agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |