CT SB00519 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - File Number 617
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - File Number 617
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To modify statutes concerning disclosure to a defendant in a criminal matter to provide for a more open process.
Title
An Act Concerning Open File Disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Senate | File Number 617 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 368 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/26 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |