CT SB00509 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To permit newly discovered scientific evidence to be considered in the same manner as DNA evidence for the purpose of a petition for a new trial.
Title
An Act Concerning Newly Discovered Evidence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 266 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 144 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 144 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Public Act 18-61 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House Passed |
2018-05-04 | Senate | House Calendar Number 508 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-04-19 | Senate | File Number 615 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 365 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/28 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |