CT SB00506 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Public Safety and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Public Safety and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require criminal background checks of all purchasers of firearms at private gun sales.
Title
An Act Requiring Criminal Background Checks For All Private Firearm Sales.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Public Safety and Security |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-08 | Senate | File Number 383 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 276 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |