CT SB00485 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - File Number 608
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - File Number 608
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To enhance the equity and effectiveness of the corporation business tax by instituting a combined unitary tax.
Title
An Act Concerning Tax Fairness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | File Number 608 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Calendar Number 433 | |
2010-04-21 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-21 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-15 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-04-06 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-06 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-18 | Public Hearing 03/22 | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |