CT SB00474 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - File Number 342
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - File Number 342
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) provide a mechanism by which broker-dealers and investment advisers may voluntarily report suspected cases of financial exploitation involving seniors and other vulnerable adults, and (2) authorize a temporary disbursement delay from securities-related accounts in suspected cases of financial exploitation.
Title
An Act Protecting Elderly Adults From Financial Exploitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | File Number 342 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 215 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |