CT SB00474 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making Adjustments To The State Budget For The Biennium Ending June 30, 2017.
Title
An Act Making Adjustments To The State Budget For The Biennium Ending June 30, 2017.
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Sen. Robert Duff [D] | Sen. Leonard Fasano [R] | Rep. Brendan Sharkey [D] |
Rep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 84 PASS AS AMENDED BY sen a (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 16 AS AMENDED (Y: 127 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 88 PASS AS AMENDED BY sen a (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 16 AS AMENDED (Y: 127 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 88 PASS AS AMENDED BY sen a (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-04-05 | House | Public Act 16-1 |
2016-03-30 | House | Signed by Governor in Original |
2016-03-29 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | In Concurrence |
2016-03-29 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-03-29 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-03-29 | House | Immediate Transmittal to the House |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3586 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Emergency Certification |