CT SB00472 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) prohibit credit rating agencies from charging a fee to consumers to place or remove a security freeze from the consumer's account, (2) require credit rating agencies to notify other credit rating agencies of a consumer's request to place or remove a security freeze from such consumer's account, and (3) increase the amount of identity theft prevention or mitigation services provided after a security breach.
Title
An Act Concerning Security Freezes On Credit Reports, Identity Theft Prevention Services And Regulations Of Credit Rating Agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 266 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 147 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 147 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Public Act 18-90 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-04 | Senate | House Calendar Number 507 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4907 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | File Number 341 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 214 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |