CT SB00470 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) expand the information on a voter registration record that may be disclosed while keeping motor vehicle operator's license numbers, identity card numbers and Social Security numbers confidential; (2) allow for notification of individuals whose absentee ballots have been rejected, so that such individuals may vote in person; and (3) require that absentee ballots be counted throughout the day of an election, primary or referendum, upon delivery from the municipal clerk.
Title
An Act Concerning Certain Voter Registration Information.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Sen. Robert Sampson [R] | Rep. Laura Devlin [R] | Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] |
Rep. Mitch Bolinsky [R] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 148 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 189 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 189 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Public Act 22-13 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Passed |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-04-27 | Senate | House Calendar Number 497 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-26 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-04-14 | Senate | File Number 491 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 337 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |